TN HB0681 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 5/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 5/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes, in a county with a metropolitan government that has imposed a privilege tax upon the privilege of occupancy in a hotel of each transient, such metropolitan government to, upon approval by ordinance of the metropolitan council, impose an additional privilege tax upon the privilege of occupancy in a hotel of each transient in an amount up to 1 percent of the consideration charged by the operator; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 5/25/2022 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1046 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 2 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0958) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 62, Nays 26, PNV 4 |
2022-04-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0938) |
2022-04-25 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0421 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1046