TN HB0681 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises the Volunteer Public Education Trust Fund Act of 1985; designates the commissioner of education and state treasurer as trustees of the fund. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises the Volunteer Public Education Trust Fund Act of 1985; designates the commissioner of education and state treasurer as trustees of the fund. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379
2019-04-30HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-18HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0625 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 379

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback