TN HB0679 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Fourth Amendment Protection Act." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 6 and Title 40, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Fourth Amendment Protection Act." - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 6 and Title 40, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2016 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee--Criminal Justice |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0782 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0679&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0679.pdf |