TN HB0676 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the dollar limits to the aggregate value of homestead exemptions, instead creating an exemption for a principal place of residence that is located on a single parcel of land not to exceed five acres in area. - Amends TCA Title 26, Chapter 2, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 26, Chapter 2, Part 3, relative to homestead exemptions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
2021-04-07HouseRec. for pass if am.; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0566 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback