TN HB0674 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, defines "food hall" for purposes of consumption of alcohol on the premises of a food hall; enacts certain requirements governing the operation of a food hall for such purposes. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to food halls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 330
2021-05-04 Signed by Governor.
2021-04-27HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-04-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-23HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-22SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 2
2021-04-22SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0353)
2021-04-22SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-19SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-15HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 14, PNV 5
2021-04-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/21
2021-04-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-08HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2021-04-08HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0077)
2021-04-01HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-16HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021
2021-03-09HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
2021-02-20HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0299 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 330

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback