TN HB0673 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Failed in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Failed in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Family Insurance Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 50, relative to insurance benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Failed in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0390 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee - no second