TN HB0670 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the court fee and tax advisory council; requires the council to consider and make recommendations on legislation that would create or increase litigation taxes or fees on criminal or civil cases and compile an annual report on all existing litigation taxes and fees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 16.
Title
As introduced, creates the court fee and tax advisory council; requires the council to consider and make recommendations on legislation that would create or increase litigation taxes or fees on criminal or civil cases and compile an annual report on all existing litigation taxes and fees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 16.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0586 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee