TN HB0670 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Failed for Lack of Second in: Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Failed for Lack of Second in: Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes the office of noncustodial parent advocacy. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
As introduced, establishes the office of noncustodial parent advocacy. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Failed for Lack of Second in: Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0739 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0670&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0670.pdf |