TN HB0666 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes disabled veterans with quadriplegia to possess and use liquid extract cannabis if certain criteria met and documentation maintained. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to cannabis for medical use.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Jason Hodges [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-19 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 1/19/2022 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Criminal Justice |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1493 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/13/2022