TN HB0658 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, limits the authority of a community oversight board to the review and consideration of matters reported to it and the issuance of advisory reports and recommendations to agencies involved in public safety and the administration of justice. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, limits the authority of a community oversight board to the review and consideration of matters reported to it and the issuance of advisory reports and recommendations to agencies involved in public safety and the administration of justice. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE AMENDMENT # 2 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Pub. Ch. 320
2019-05-15 Effective date(s) 05/08/2019
2019-05-08 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-29HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-23HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-18SenateConference Committee report adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 6, PNV 1
2019-04-15HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/17/19
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee appointed. (Bell, White, Akbari)
2019-04-04HouseConf. comm. appointed. (Curcio, Lamberth, Shaw)
2019-04-04HouseH. refused to recede from am. no. 1 HB0658
2019-04-01HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/4/19
2019-04-01SenateSenate refused to recede from amendment #1
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-28HouseH. nonconcurred in S. am. no. SA 1 HB0658
2019-03-21HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/25/19
2019-03-18SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4, PNV 2
2019-03-18SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0061)
2019-03-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0060)
2019-03-18SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-03-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-14HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 66, Nays 26, PNV 1
2019-03-14HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0069)
2019-03-14HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0020)
2019-03-07HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 2/27/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseReassigned to Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1407 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 320

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback