TN HB0658 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lengthens the period, from 30 to 45 days, before an annexation approved in a referendum becomes effective. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 49; Title 67; Title 68 and Chapter 1101 of the Public Acts of 1998.
Title
As introduced, lengthens the period, from 30 to 45 days, before an annexation approved in a referendum becomes effective. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 49; Title 67; Title 68 and Chapter 1101 of the Public Acts of 1998.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor change. |
2017-04-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0501 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee