TN HB0656 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that within 10 days of receiving the nonresidential buprenorphine guidelines and standards a health-related board that licenses any practitioner authorized to prescribe buprenorphine must post such guidelines and standards on the board's website. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, specifies that within 10 days of receiving the nonresidential buprenorphine guidelines and standards a health-related board that licenses any practitioner authorized to prescribe buprenorphine must post such guidelines and standards on the board's website. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-17HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-17HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 4, PNV 0
2019-04-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0181)
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1060 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback