TN HB0656 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of safety, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 20.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of safety, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 20.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 134 | |
2011-04-07 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-03-31 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0207 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 134