TN HB0655 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of transportation, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of transportation, June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327 | |
2011-05-19 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-12 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Government Operations Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0206 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 327