TN HB0654 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, replaces the requirement that if a witness cannot be found, a copy of a subpoena issued by the comptroller of the treasury to the witness be left at the place of residence of the witness with the requirement that a copy of the subpoena be mailed by first-class mail to the last known address of the witness; adds, as an alternative to hand delivery of a subpoena, that the subpoena be mailed to the witness by certified mail, return receipt requested. - Amends TCA Section 8-4-203.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 8-4-203, relative to subpoena service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 442 | |
2021-04-26 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0536 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/13/2021