TN HB0653 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits local governmental entities from paying, compensating, awarding, or remitting funds in the form of, or facilitating the conversion of compensation or funds to, blockchain, cryptocurrency, non-fungible tokens, or virtual currency to an individual person, corporation, or other entity (or procuring the services for the performance of any such actions) without the prior written approval of the state treasurer. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 41; Title 42; Title 49; Title 54; Title 64; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 41; Title 42; Title 49; Title 54; Title 64; Title 68 and Title 69, relative to public finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 861 | |
2022-03-31 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0535 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022