TN HB0645 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "The Educator Protection Act of 2015." - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, enacts "The Educator Protection Act of 2015." - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493 | |
2015-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-20 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0604 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 493
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0645&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0645.pdf |