TN HB0644 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that renovations of memorials are excluded from the petition for waiver process under the Tennessee Heritage Protection Act of 2016; excludes from coverage under the act buildings and structures that have reached the end of their useful lives and are approved for demolition by the state building commission; requires that prior to any decision to demolish a memorial designated as a national historic landmark or listed on the register of historic places, the historical commission make comments to the state building commission. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-412.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that renovations of memorials are excluded from the petition for waiver process under the Tennessee Heritage Protection Act of 2016; excludes from coverage under the act buildings and structures that have reached the end of their useful lives and are approved for demolition by the state building commission; requires that prior to any decision to demolish a memorial designated as a national historic landmark or listed on the register of historic places, the historical commission make comments to the state building commission. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-412.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 201 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2017 | |
2017-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0117) |
2017-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-13 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0927 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 201