TN HB0642 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Def. to Summer Study in Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Def. to Summer Study in Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to create an evidence-based implicit bias training program for healthcare professionals related to maternal and infant mortality; requires the department to collect certain data; and establishes a perinatal patient bill of rights. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to maternal mortality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0956 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee