TN HB0641 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a lifetime sportsman license for adopted children, under the age of 13; provides that the child's guardian must apply for the license on the child's behalf within 36 months from the adoption; provides that the fish and wildlife commission will set the license fee. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 70, Chapter 2, relative to lifetime sportsman licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 241 | |
2021-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0119 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021