TN HB0641 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20, the number of days after the end of each calendar month, within which a qualified public depository must submit to the state treasurer a report of the average daily balance of all secured public deposits held by the depository. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20, the number of days after the end of each calendar month, within which a qualified public depository must submit to the state treasurer a report of the average daily balance of all secured public deposits held by the depository. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-03 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0716 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee