TN HB0640 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a good faith donor of apparently usable feminine hygiene products to a bona fide charitable or nonprofit organization for distribution to persons in need of the product is not subject to criminal or civil liability in the absence of gross negligence or intentional misconduct. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 28 and Title 53.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 28 and Title 53, relative to feminine hygiene product donation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 207 | |
2021-04-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0974 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021