TN HB0639 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds the legislative librarian to the list of persons to whom the commissioners of revenue and transportation must provide a copy of their joint annual report summarizing the amount and source of tax revenues received and deposited during the preceding fiscal year in the transportation equity fund. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08HouseWithdrawn.
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseRef. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-02-01HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-26HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0131 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback