TN HB0636 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Health Benefit Plan Network Access and Adequacy Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 47; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 47; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Charlie Baum [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0603 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee