TN HB0634 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts water furnished by a utility district and used exclusively in a farming operation from sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, exempts water furnished by a utility district and used exclusively in a farming operation from sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-26HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-25HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0100)
2019-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1460 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-25 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback