TN HB0632 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, grants discretion to the state registrar to issue a delayed birth certificate upon finding a preponderance of the evidence weighs in favor of an applicant; permits the state registrar to consider documentation such as obituaries and birth or death certificates of the applicant's parents or siblings, property tax records, and certain other documentary evidence that may support the applicant's claimed place of birth. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 10 and Title 68, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 10 and Title 68, Chapter 3, relative to vital records.
Sponsors
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0192 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee