TN HB0629 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an LEA to provide information on its website concerning the career-based experiences available to high school students. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to K-12 education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1071 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee