TN HB0628 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes electronic transmission of the copy of a judgment of conviction of a person for committing certain offenses of abuse of an elderly or vulnerable adult that is required to be sent to the department of health by clerks of the court. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 5, relative to elderly and vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-04-06 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0432 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee