TN HB0623 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enables a police officer who is a member of the state retirement system to be eligible for service retirement upon completion of 25 years of creditable service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enables a police officer who is a member of the state retirement system to be eligible for service retirement upon completion of 25 years of creditable service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1237 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback