TN HB0620 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Pub. Ch. 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Pub. Ch. 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions of the Border Region Retail Tourism Development District Act. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 40.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions of the Border Region Retail Tourism Development District Act. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Pub. Ch. 511 | |
2019-06-06 | Effective date(s) 06/03/2019 | |
2019-06-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0217) |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0537 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 511