TN HB0615 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-6)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, designates the Holy Bible as the official state book. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, designates the Holy Bible as the official state book. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (Y: 33 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (Y: 43 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE REREFER TO COMMITTEE (Y: 9 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: REREFER TO COMMITTEE (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Ragan PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 48 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 44 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REREFER TO COMMITTEE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-01 - House - STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-14 Vetoed by Governor.
2016-04-07HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2016-04-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-05HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2016-04-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 19, Nays 8, PNV 3
2016-04-04SenateSenate Amendment #4 withdrawn.
2016-04-04SenateSenate Amendment #3 withdrawn.
2016-04-04SenateSenate Amendment #2 withdrawn.
2016-04-04SenateSenate Amendment #1 withdrawn.
2016-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016
2016-03-29SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
2016-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
2016-03-23SenateNotice to Recall from Committee Filed
2015-04-16SenateRe-refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-04-16SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2015-04-16SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2015-04-15HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2015-04-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 55, Nays 38, PNV 3
2015-04-15HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0437)
2015-04-15HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0433)
2015-04-14HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0363)
2015-04-14HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2015-04-13HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2015-04-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015
2015-04-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
2015-04-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-04-01HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 4/7/2015
2015-04-01HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2015-04-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-25HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
2015-03-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-25HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015
2015-03-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
2015-03-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-24HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2015-02-18HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2015-02-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-12HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2015-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-10HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1108 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-16 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback