TN HB0615 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes confidential all information furnished by a witness during the course of certain investigations. - Amends TCA Title 10.
Title
As introduced, makes confidential all information furnished by a witness during the course of certain investigations. - Amends TCA Title 10.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to last calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 02/25/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0170 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0615&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0615.pdf |