TN HB0614 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Pub. Ch. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Pub. Ch. 612
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, delays the implementation of certain provisions of the Tennessee Voter Confidence Act; revises provisions governing "top race" and audits; revises other various provisions of the Act. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Chapter 1108 of the Public Acts of 2008.
Title
As enacted, delays the implementation of certain provisions of the Tennessee Voter Confidence Act; revises provisions governing "top race" and audits; revises other various provisions of the Act. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Chapter 1108 of the Public Acts of 2008.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 9 BY Herron (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 8 BY Herron (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 7 BY Herron (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 6 BY Herron (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 5 BY Herron (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-15 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 9 BY Herron (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 8 BY Herron (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 7 BY Herron (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 6 BY Herron (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 5 BY Herron (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-15 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Pub. Ch. 612 | |
2010-02-09 | Effective date(s) 01/22/10 | |
2010-01-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-01-13 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-01-13 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-01-12 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-01-12 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-01-12 | Passed S., Ayes 22, Nays 10 | |
2010-01-12 | Am. 9 tabled. Ayes 19, Nays 13 | |
2010-01-12 | Am. 8 tabled. Ayes 19, Nays 13 | |
2010-01-12 | Am. 7 tabled. Ayes 20, Nays 10 | |
2010-01-12 | Am. 6 tabled. Ayes 20, Nays 10 | |
2010-01-11 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 01/12/2010 | |
2009-06-18 | Failed to pass S., Ayes 16, Nays 14 | |
2009-06-18 | Am. 5 tabled | |
2009-06-18 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-06-17 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-17 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 20, PNV 1 | |
2009-06-17 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0167) | |
2009-06-17 | Am. no. 3 tabled. Ayes 66, Nays 28 | |
2009-06-17 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0800) | |
2009-06-17 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-06-16 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | Reset on regular cal. for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-06-12 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar | |
2009-06-09 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar | |
2009-06-03 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-07 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Elections of S&LG to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0872 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 612