TN HB0612 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes the procedure for the administrative office of the courts to issue payment to an expert who makes a court-ordered determination of intellectual disability in a person who has been sentenced to death prior to May 11, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2, relative to the determination of intellectual disability of those sentenced to death.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255 | |
2023-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/11/2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/11/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0284 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023