TN HB0605 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 04/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes direct payments to be made to a business entity solely owned by a broker, affiliate broker, or other licensee licensed by the real estate commission formed for the purpose of receiving compensation for the broker, affiliate broker, or other licensee. - Amends TCA Title 48; Title 62 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 48; Title 62 and Title 66, relative to compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2021 | |
2021-04-12 | Pub. Ch. 94 | |
2021-04-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0569 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 94