TN HB0605 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases classification of offense of patronizing prostitution from a Class B to a Class A misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, increases classification of offense of patronizing prostitution from a Class B to a Class A misdemeanor. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Beth Harwell [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] |
Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 169 | |
2017-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0551 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 169