TN HB0603 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, broadens the category of persons authorized to carry handguns within a public park to include handgun carry permit holders. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Section 33-6-413; Section 38-8-116; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Title 50; Section 58-1-112 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 10-7-504; Section 33-6-413; Section 38-8-116; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Title 50; Section 58-1-112 and Title 70, relative to firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseRef. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0855 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback