TN HB0592 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Failed for lack of second in: Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Failed for lack of second in: Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a defendant receive a bail hearing within 48 hours of arrest; requires that a magistrate release a defendant on personal recognizance unless there is clear and convincing evidence of certain conditions; specifies that a magistrate must set bail at the lowest amount necessary to reasonably assure the defendant's appearance; prohibits a magistrate from setting bail at an amount the otherwise-eligible defendant cannot afford solely to detain the defendant. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 11, relative to bail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Failed for lack of second in: Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0813 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee