TN HB0589 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds district attorneys general to those the department must release confidential information to upon presentation of an appropriate court order. - Amends TCA Title 10 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10 and Title 37, relative to department of children's services records.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 197 | |
2023-04-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0610 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/24/2023