TN HB0586 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits eligible postsecondary institutions, for purposes of state lottery proceeds, from denying a student residential housing on the campus of, or in affiliation with, the eligible postsecondary institution solely because of the student's award of a Tennessee STEP UP scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, prohibits eligible postsecondary institutions, for purposes of state lottery proceeds, from denying a student residential housing on the campus of, or in affiliation with, the eligible postsecondary institution solely because of the student's award of a Tennessee STEP UP scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0516 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.