TN HB0585 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for harassment if the person committed the offense because of the victim's employment as a first responder; defines "first responder" for the purposes of harassment. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 38 and Title 39, relative to first responders.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Charlie Baum [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1138 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-20 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee