TN HB0582 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 387
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 387
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, confers upon law enforcement agencies, as well as the department of human services, the authority, during the course of an elder abuse investigation, to require a medical examination of the person if the agency is not sure that the adult is in imminent danger. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, confers upon law enforcement agencies, as well as the department of human services, the authority, during the course of an elder abuse investigation, to require a medical examination of the person if the agency is not sure that the adult is in imminent danger. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 387 | |
2015-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0457 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 387
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0582&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0582.pdf |