TN HB0580 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, eliminates the professional privilege tax for attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17, relative to taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08HouseWithdrawn.
2023-04-18HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023
2023-03-29HousePlaced behind the budget
2023-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2023
2023-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-26HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1122 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback