TN HB0580 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lowers from 5 percent to 4 percent the limit at which the expenses incurred by the department of economic and community development to administer the broadband accessibility grant program must not exceed from the total amount appropriated to the program in any fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 65 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, lowers from 5 percent to 4 percent the limit at which the expenses incurred by the department of economic and community development to administer the broadband accessibility grant program must not exceed from the total amount appropriated to the program in any fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 65 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1037 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee