TN HB0579 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the medical laboratory board to standardize quality control and electronic recordkeeping for all medical laboratories by rule; specifies that the fees that must accompany a renewal application include reporting fees set by the board. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 68, relative to the Tennessee Medical Laboratory Act.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0360 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee