TN HB0573 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the notice requirement for meetings conducted under the Tennessee Governmental Entity Review Law, from 10 days prior to the hearing in newspapers of general circulation to seven days prior to such hearing on the general assembly website. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29, relative to the publishing of notice for meetings held under the Tennessee Governmental Entity Review Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 404 | |
2021-05-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1294 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 404