TN HB0573 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds the offense of aggravated burglary to the list of offenses ineligible for judicial diversion. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 15 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
As introduced, adds the offense of aggravated burglary to the list of offenses ineligible for judicial diversion. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 39, Chapter 15 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 1/17/2018 |
2017-04-25 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0682 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committe