TN HB0568 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, limits an administrative agency's authority to promulgate rules without a public hearing. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 5, relative to administrative procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 531 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA2 Ayes 72, Nays 20 PNV 0 HB0568 |
2021-05-04 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 5/4/21 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0315) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0358) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0148) |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1081 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 531