TN HB0568 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Failed for lack of second in: Children & Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Failed for lack of second in: Children & Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local law enforcement to conduct in-person checks to ensure person subject to order of protection has complied with dispossession of firearms requirement; makes various other changes regarding the dispossession of firearms requirement. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, requires local law enforcement to conduct in-person checks to ensure person subject to order of protection has complied with dispossession of firearms requirement; makes various other changes regarding the dispossession of firearms requirement. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Failed for lack of second in: Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0828 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn.