TN HB0565 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends civil and criminal statutes of limitation for certain acts of abuse against minors; increases the penalty for intentional failure to report child abuse or child sexual abuse. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 37 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends civil and criminal statutes of limitation for certain acts of abuse against minors; increases the penalty for intentional failure to report child abuse or child sexual abuse. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 37 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1252 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback